IL HB3901 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Agency and Grantee Bonus Prohibition Act. Provides that no State agency or hospital shall pay from State funds, in whole or in part, and no employee of a State agency or hospital may receive a bonus as all or part of his or her compensation, including such bonuses as may be received for work on capital projects. Provides that no grantee shall pay and no employee or contract worker of a grantee may receive a bonus paid from grant funds awarded for operational expenses as all or part of his or her compensation, including such bonuses as may be received for work on capital projects. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AGENCY BONUS PROHIBITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3901&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3901.htm |