IL HB3899 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Makes changes to provisions concerning the use of not-for-profit agencies for persons with significant disabilities (instead of facilities for persons with severe disabilities). Provides that a not-for-profit agency shall be a qualified agency if it is, among other requirements, accredited by a nationally-recognized accrediting organization or certified as a development training provider by the Department of Human Services (rather than requiring the agency to meet the applicable Department just standards). Requires the Department to develop guidelines listing appropriate national accrediting organizations within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires the State Use Committee to, not less than every 3 years, develop a strategic plan for increasing the number of products or services purchased from qualified agencies (rather than developing one 5-year strategic plan). Sets forth provisions concerning subcontracts. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PRO CD-PERSONS W/ DISABILITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0203 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |