IL HB3897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Trampoline Safety Act. Provides for the adoption of rules and regulations by the Director of the Department of Labor, and specifies further duties of the Director. Provides requirements for registration and inspection of trampoline courts. Specifies the duties of owners or operators of trampoline courts. Provides requirements for the use of trampoline courts by patrons. Provides an enforcement provision and specifies compliance for trampoline courts in existence in this State prior to the effective date of this Act. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Trampoline Court Safety Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAMPOLINE SAFETY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-009-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 064-046-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-004-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-15HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback