IL HB3896 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sexually Violent Persons Commitment Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall send the notice, postmarked within one business day of the court order approving the conditional release, discharge, or any court-ordered change in the custody status of the detainee or sexually violent person, unless unusual circumstances do not permit advance written notification, or immediately if a detainee or civilly committed sexually violent person escapes or dies (rather than at least 60 days before the date the person committed under this Act is placed on conditional release, discharged, or if a detainee or civilly committed sexually violent person escapes, dies, or is subject to any court-ordered change in the custody status of the detainee or sexually violent person, unless unusual circumstances do not permit advance written notification) to the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice and the last-known address of the victim, an adult member of the victim's family, if the victim died as a result of the act of sexual violence, or the victim's parent or legal guardian, if the victim is younger than 18 years old. Effective immediately.
Title
SEXUALLY VIOLENT PERSON-NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0299 |
2015-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2015 |
2015-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 207 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |