IL HB3895 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as engrossed, with the following changes: Further amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department Corrections shall implement a wellness program to provide employees and staff with support to address both professional and personal challenges as they relate to the correctional environment. Provides that the Department shall establish response teams to provide comprehensive support to employees and staff affected by events that are both duty-related and not duty-related and provide training to response team members. Provides that the wellness program shall be accessible to any Department employee, whether full-time or part-time, contractual or temporary staff and approved volunteers. Makes a similar change to a provision concerning employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice. Adds a preamble concerning the policy of the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice regarding employees seeking mental health care.
Title
CD CORR-CORRECTIONAL OFFICER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0616 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-018-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 002-000-000 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-12 | Senate | To Criminal Law- Special Issues |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-042-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |