IL HB3879 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person who, in good faith, seeks or obtains emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing an overdose shall not be deemed to violate his or her conditions of aftercare release (for a juvenile) or conditions of parole or mandatory supervised release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-PAROLE-OVERDOSE HELP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2020-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2020-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-08-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2.5-80Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-3-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback