IL HB3877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Vapor Products Regulatory Act. Provides for the licensing and regulation of retail sellers of vapor pens and vapor products by the Department of Revenue. Sets requirements for licensure, including qualifications and disqualifications, and sets annual licensing fee of $75. Provides the Department of Revenue with regulatory authority, provides for licensing and appeals from licensing decisions made by the Department of Revenue. Provides that persons licensed as retailers under the Cigarette Tax Act need not obtain a license under this act to sell vapor products. Defines terms. Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act to exclude vapor products from the definition of "alternative nicotine product". Amends the State Finance Act to create the Vapor Products Compliance Fund. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
VAPOR PRODUCTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-001-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 675 | 1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |