IL HB3877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Vapor Products Regulatory Act. Provides for the licensing and regulation of retail sellers of vapor pens and vapor products by the Department of Revenue. Sets requirements for licensure, including qualifications and disqualifications, and sets annual licensing fee of $75. Provides the Department of Revenue with regulatory authority, provides for licensing and appeals from licensing decisions made by the Department of Revenue. Provides that persons licensed as retailers under the Cigarette Tax Act need not obtain a license under this act to sell vapor products. Defines terms. Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act to exclude vapor products from the definition of "alternative nicotine product". Amends the State Finance Act to create the Vapor Products Compliance Fund. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VAPOR PRODUCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-001-000
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-08HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
7206751.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback