IL HB3876 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a resident of this State who purchases a vehicle in another state and transports the vehicle to Illinois shall apply for registration and certificate of title as soon as practicable, but in no event less than 45 days after the purchase of the vehicle. Provides that the owner of such a vehicle shall display any temporary permit or registration issued in accordance with the provisions of the Code. Restricts the issuance of a temporary registration permit to the holder of a valid Illinois driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TEMP REGISTRATION PLATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0209
2023-06-30HouseEffective Date January 1, 2024
2023-06-30HouseGovernor Approved
2023-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2023-05-11HousePassed Both Houses
2023-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2023-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
2023-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
2023-04-27SenateSecond Reading
2023-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
2023-04-26SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2023-04-18SenateAssigned to Transportation
2023-03-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-03-31SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-31SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
2023-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
2023-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2023-03-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2023-03-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
2023-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
2023-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
2023-02-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-402Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback