IL HB3872 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that in addition to a freeze on a minor's consumer report, a freeze may be placed on the minor's credit file. Establishes the procedures for obtaining a freeze on a minor's or protected consumer's credit file. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CREDIT FILE FREEZE MINORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052MMAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback