IL HB3870 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is the public policy of the State to secure for all individuals within Illinois the freedom from discrimination against any individual because of his or her political affiliation.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-11-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-11-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-11-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-11-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-11-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3870&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3870.htm |