IL HB3870 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that for purposes of determining eligibility for the continuation or duration of any benefits under the Act, the Department of Employment Security shall exclude from consideration for a period of 90 days any income earned by an individual from self-employment from a business or activity commenced by the individual after the individual first became eligible for benefits under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMP-EXCLUDE SELF EMP INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | To Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3870&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3870.htm |