IL HB3869 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires in-service training for school personnel to include training on civil rights and in cultural diversity, including racial and ethnic sensitivity and implicit racial bias. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-IMPLICIT BIAS TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0014
2017-06-30HouseEffective Date July 1, 2017
2017-06-30HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-04SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-051-001
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-002-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback