IL HB3866 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that an action to collect a debt arising from a violation of a municipal ordinance may not be filed more than 7 years after the date of the alleged violation.
Title
CIV PRO-LIMITS-DEBT COLLECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-004-000 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-02-19 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2020-01-31 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |