IL HB3865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois District Consolidation Commission Act. Creates the Illinois District Consolidation Commission for the purpose of recommending what school districts in the State to consolidate, with a goal of reducing the total number of school districts in the State by at least 60%. Requires all State agencies to assist the Commission as reasonably necessary, and provides that the State Board of Education shall provide administrative and other support. Sets forth requirements concerning membership and powers. Requires the Commission to issue a report concerning recommended consolidations by November 6, 2017. Requires the Commission to submit proposed legislation to the General Assembly enacting the proposed consolidations by November 6, 2017. Requires the General Assembly to vote on the legislation. Provides that the Commission shall spend no more than $1,000,000 on expenses. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Illinois District Consolidation Commission Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Repeals the Act January 1, 2019. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DIST CONSOLIDATION CMSN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3865&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3865.htm |