IL HB3860 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Acupuncture Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Acupuncture Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides that members of the Board of Acupuncture may not serve more than 2 consecutive full terms (rather than for more than 8 years). Eliminates certain powers and duties of the Board. Eliminates a requirement that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation seek the input of the Board on certain matters. Removes a provision allowing the Department to require a person seeking to resume active status to complete a period of evaluated clinical experience. Changes references to "registration" to references to "license". Provides that the Department has the authority and power to investigate any and all licensed activity. Removes a requirement that the Department mail a registration renewal form to registrants 60 days before the expiration of the current registration and a notice that a registration has lapsed. Makes changes to provisions concerning certification of the record to a court. Repeals provisions concerning maintaining a roster of licensed and disciplined persons. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ACUPUNCTURE PRACTICE-SUNSET
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 2 | 120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 2 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3860&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3860.htm |