IL HB3859 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Foreign Bank Representative Office Act. Removes from the definition of "foreign bank" a bank, savings association, or trust company which is organized in a state or territory of the United States, including the District of Columbia, outside of the State of Illinois and a national bank having its principal place of business in a state or territory of the United States, including the District of Columbia, other than the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
FOREIGN BANKS-DEFINITION
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 650 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |