IL HB3855 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that certain penalties regarding the operation of an uninsured motor vehicle apply to any operator of a motor vehicle subject to registration under a law of another state that is similar to the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-OPERATION UNINSURED VEH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-27HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2021
2021-05-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-04-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2021-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-707Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback