IL HB3851 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act to provide that if an individual's benefit year begins on or after March 8, 2020, but before the week following the last week of a disaster period established by the gubernatorial disaster proclamations in response to COVID-19, recovery by suit in the name of the People of the State of Illinois or recoupment from benefits payable to an individual for any week shall be permanently waived if the sum was received by the individual without fault on his or her part. Provides that, in cases of such permanent waiver of recovery or recoupment, the Director of Employment Security may not request the Comptroller or the Secretary of the Treasury to withhold a sum of benefits for which an individual is found to be ineligible. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMPLOYMENT-RECOUPMENT WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-24 | House | To Wage Policy & Study Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3851&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3851.htm |