IL HB3851 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an employer to refuse to make certain reasonable accommodations in the workplace for an employee protected under an order of protection. Provides that an employer is not required to make the reasonable accommodations if they cause undue hardship on the work operations of the employer. For purposes of the new provisions, defines "undue hardship" as significant difficulty or expense on the operation of an employer, when considered in light of: (1) the nature and cost of the reasonable accommodation needed; (2) the overall financial resources, number of employees, and the number, type, and placement of the work locations of an employer; and (3) the type of operation of the employer, including the composition, structure, and functions of the workforce of the employer, the geographic separateness of the employee's work location from the employer, and the administrative or fiscal relationship of the work location to the employer. Provides that prior to making the reasonable accommodations, an employer may verify that an employee is protected by an order of protection entered under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 or the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-PROTECTION ORDERS
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3851&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3851.htm |