IL HB3850 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Reproductive Health Act. Creates the Illinois Abortion Law of 2019 containing the provisions of the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975 before its repeal by Public Act 101-13, as well as provisions defining "viability" to include when, in the medical judgment of the attending physician based on the particular facts of the case before the attending physician, the unborn child has a fetal heartbeat, and defining "fetal heartbeat" as the cardiac activity or the steady and repetitive rhythmic contraction of the fetal heart within the gestational sac. Creates the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act of 2019 and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act of 2019 containing the provisions of the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act before their repeal by Public Act 101-13. Amends various Acts by restoring the language that existed before the amendment of those Acts by Public Act 101-13. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-07-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-07-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-06-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-06-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-06-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
21052Amended CodeCitation Text
21053Amended CodeCitation Text
21056.2New CodeSee Bill Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.4Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.4aRepealed CodeCitation Text
2256022Amended CodeCitation Text
2256036Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-43Amended CodeCitation Text
225957.5Amended CodeCitation Text
4105351Amended CodeCitation Text
410709.1New CodeSee Bill Text
415556.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-3013Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
735511-107.1aNew CodeSee Bill Text
73558-802Amended CodeCitation Text
745703Amended CodeCitation Text
7506515Amended CodeCitation Text
77555ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback