IL HB3850 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2015 and 2016 taxable years, the exemption for veterans with disabilities carries over to the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year. Provides that, for the 2017 taxable year and thereafter, the exemption for veterans with disabilities carries over to the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain the exemption before death, but who would have qualified for the exemption in the current taxable year if he or she had survived. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback