IL HB3840 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires a hospital organized or licensed under those Acts to provide a patient who is treated for opioid overdose at the hospital with one dose of or one prescription for an opioid antagonist upon discharge from the hospital, free of charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOSPITALS-OPIOID ANTAGONIST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-10-29SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-10-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-05-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-05-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-032-000
2019-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-004-000
2019-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-05-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103308bNew CodeSee Bill Text
210856.14hNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback