IL HB3830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that State agencies, when hiring for full-time, temporary positions with an expected tenure of 12 to 24 months for the position, shall give preference to a qualified applicant who is from a low-income household or has been unemployed for 6 months or more. Provides that State agencies, when hiring for internships, student assistant positions, and summer positions, shall give preference to a qualified applicant who resides in a low-income household, is up to 21 years old, and is currently attending high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-LOW-INCOME HOUSEHOLD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
204158b.21New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback