IL HB3826 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that an election authority shall notify all qualified votes, except voters who have been permanently placed on vote by mail status, not more than 90 days nor less than 45 days before a general election (rather than a general or consolidated election) of the option for permanent vote by mail status. Provides that an election authority shall allow voters to opt out of notifications of the option for permanent vote by mail status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-NOTICE MAILING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Ethics & Elections
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-2.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback