IL HB3826 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a subdivider who has been assessed and paid impact fees on real estate in a municipality may not be assessed or charged real estate transfer taxes or fees on that same real estate. Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-SUBDIVIDER TRANSFER TAXES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-15SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-3-19Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback