IL HB3820 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 2 with changes. Modifies provisions of the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that it is the public policy of the State of Illinois for each purchasing agency to use the terms and conditions of State financial assistance awards and State procurements to maximize the use of goods, products, and materials (rather than goods, products, materials, and services) produced in Illinois. Provides that compliance reports submitted under the Act shall, among other items, include the purchasing agency's analysis of goods, products, and materials (rather than goods, products, materials, and services) not subject to the Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-003-002 |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 517 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 517 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |