IL HB3820 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Increases by $1,100,000,000 the amount of General Obligation Bonds authorized for State or local highways, arterial highways, freeways, roads, bridges, and structures separating highways and railroads and roads and for grants to counties, municipalities, townships, or road districts for planning, engineering, acquisition, construction, reconstruction, development, improvement, extension, and all construction-related expenses of the public infrastructure and other transportation improvement projects related to economic development. Amends aggregate General Obligation Bond authorization amounts to reflect the $1,100,000,000 increase. Effective immediately.
Title
BOND ACT-TRANSPORTATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-12 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2015-03-20 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2015-03-20 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2015-03-20 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2015-03-19 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2015-03-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 330 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |