IL HB3819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Microphone-Enabled Devices Act. Contains legislative findings and defines terms. Requires that a private entity give written notice to and obtain the informed consent of a user before enabling the microphone in the user's device. Provides for a private right of action for damages, attorney's fees, and injunctive relief. Excludes State agencies and units of local government. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MICROPHONE-ENABLED DEVICES ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseTabled
2017-05-15HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback