IL HB3819 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0887 |
2014-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 15 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |