IL HB3818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that a public officer or public employee may not, with the intent to obtain any money, fee, commission, credit, gift, gratuity, thing of value, or compensation for the award of the contract or operation of the video gaming, solicit, intimidate, or coerce the owner or agent of the owner of a licensed establishment, licensed veterans establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, or licensed fraternal establishment to enter into any contract with another person for the operation of a video gaming terminal under the Act. Provides that a violation is a Class 3 felony. Provides that it is not a defense to a violation of this provision that the public officer or public employee did not receive any monetary consideration or other thing of value from the operator or proposed operator of the video gaming terminal or from the owner or agent of the owner of the licensed establishment, licensed veterans establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, or licensed fraternal establishment for the solicitation, intimidation, or coercion of the owner or agent of the licensed establishment, licensed veterans establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, or licensed fraternal establishment. Provides that any contract entered into in violation of this provision on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act is null and void. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-VOID CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-02-14HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-08HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304046New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback