IL HB3817 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURTS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-15SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-033-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-21HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback