IL HB3810 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires school boards to develop a trauma response protocol that shall be implemented in response to a traumatic event at a school, including, but not limited to, a shooting at the school. Sets forth various requirements for the protocol, including response by hospitals, trauma intervention services, and community engagement. Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and Hospital Licensing Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRAUMA PROTOCOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text
11033010New CodeSee Bill Text
210856.27New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback