IL HB3806 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, upon request, to provide DUI service providers licensed by the State and any court, as defined, with copies of identification and arrest data the Department receives from federal, State, and local law enforcement agencies. Establishes the DUI Service Provider Effectiveness Program Exploratory Committee to create an audit and evaluation process that permits the evaluation of treatment and intervention outcomes of licensed DUI service providers so that persons interested in DUI treatment or intervention services can make informed decisions concerning provider selection and courts can better determine which DUI service providers to keep on their approved-provider lists. Contains provisions concerning membership on the Committee, initial appointments, voting rights, reporting requirements, and other matters. Requires the Committee to prepare and publish in a central publication information obtained through the audit and evaluation process established by the Committee, but not before performing certain tasks, including the development of: (i) a process and statistical method of outcome analysis and research that targets DUI recidivism as a measure of the treatment or intervention effectiveness of each DUI service provider; and (ii) a standardized method or process by which a court may consult and collaborate with a DUI service provider whose program of DUI treatment or intervention services fails to meet or adequately address the needs of clients residing within the court's judicial circuit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds a requirement concerning DUI treatment review surveys. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUI SERVICE PROVIDER-COMMITTEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-31HouseArrived in House
2018-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2018
2018-05-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2017
2017-05-22SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2017
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-001-000
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-28HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-08HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030110-65New CodeSee Bill Text
203015-10Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-501.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback