IL HB3806 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, upon request, to provide DUI service providers licensed by the State and any court, as defined, with copies of identification and arrest data the Department receives from federal, State, and local law enforcement agencies. Establishes the DUI Service Provider Effectiveness Program Exploratory Committee to create an audit and evaluation process that permits the evaluation of treatment and intervention outcomes of licensed DUI service providers so that persons interested in DUI treatment or intervention services can make informed decisions concerning provider selection and courts can better determine which DUI service providers to keep on their approved-provider lists. Contains provisions concerning membership on the Committee, initial appointments, voting rights, reporting requirements, and other matters. Requires the Committee to prepare and publish in a central publication information obtained through the audit and evaluation process established by the Committee, but not before performing certain tasks, including the development of: (i) a process and statistical method of outcome analysis and research that targets DUI recidivism as a measure of the treatment or intervention effectiveness of each DUI service provider; and (ii) a standardized method or process by which a court may consult and collaborate with a DUI service provider whose program of DUI treatment or intervention services fails to meet or adequately address the needs of clients residing within the court's judicial circuit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds a requirement concerning DUI treatment review surveys. Effective immediately.
Title
DUI SERVICE PROVIDER-COMMITTEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2018-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-001-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 10-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 301 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-501.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |