IL HB3803 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fair Patient Billing Act. Provides that a hospital shall proactively offer information on charity care options available to uninsured patients, regardless of their immigration status or residency. Effective on the first day of the first month immediately following 90 days after becoming law.
Title
FAIR PATIENT-COLLECTION ACTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0504 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date December 1, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-002-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 104-008-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 010-003-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 88 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |