IL HB3796 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1129 |
2014-12-08 | House | Effective Date December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-03 | House | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-013-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto December 3, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 076-036-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 6, 2014 |
2014-06-27 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-001-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-036-001 |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2014-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |