IL HB3794 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that an arrest warrant issued for an offender who violated a condition of his or her probation, conditional discharge, or supervision where there is danger of his or her fleeing the jurisdiction or causing serious harm to others or when the offender fails to answer a summons or notice from the clerk of the court or sheriff shall remain active for a period not to exceed 5 years from the date the warrant was issued unless a motion to extend the warrant is filed by the office of the State's Attorney or by, or on behalf of, the agency supervising the wanted person. Provides that a motion to extend the warrant shall be filed within one year of the date the warrant is issued and notice shall be provided to the office of the sheriff. Provides that if a person is serving a sentence of probation, conditional discharge, or supervision for a firearm offense or forcible felony, the warrant shall remain active for a period of 10 years from the date the warrant was issued at which time the wanted person's period of probation, conditional discharge, or supervision shall terminate unsatisfactorily as a matter of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-PROBATION VIOLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-003-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-6-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback