IL HB3792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires each school district to require that all students in grade 6 receive education on work ethics, including, but not limited to, learning how to be reliable, be professional, take initiative, be positive, respect authority, and have integrity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-WORK ETHICS CURRICULUM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-06-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-032-000
2017-06-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-26HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-005-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback