IL HB3790 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2018 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-PER DIEM & COLAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text
251206.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback