IL HB3787 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that members of the Children of Incarcerated Parents Task Force shall be appointed by the Secretary of Human Services (rather than the Lieutenant Governor), unless otherwise indicated. Provides that the Department of Human Services (rather than the Lieutenant Governor) shall provide administrative and technical support to the Task Force and shall be responsible for administering its operations, appointing a chairperson, and ensuring that the requirements of the Task Force are met. Repeals a provision providing that an Article of the Code regarding the Task Force is repealed on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
INCARCERATED PARENT TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 106F-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 106F-25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3787&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3787.htm |