IL HB3786 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Article and definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-03-21HouseTo SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-22HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-07HouseRe-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105534-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback