IL HB3784 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compulsory Attendance Article of the School Code. In a Section concerning enrolled pupils not of compulsory school age, removes provisions that allow a school or school district to deny enrollment to a student 17 years of age or older for one semester for failure to meet minimum academic standards if certain conditions are met, and provides that no child may be denied reenrollment (instead of enrollment or reenrollment) under the Section in violation of the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act or the Americans with Disabilities Act. Prohibits punitive action from being taken against truant minors (rather than chronic truants) for such truancy unless available supportive services and other school resources have been provided to the student. Provides that a truant minor may not be expelled for nonattendance unless he or she has accrued 15 consecutive days of absences without valid cause and the student cannot be located by the school district or the school district has located the student but cannot, after exhausting all available support services, compel the student to return to school. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DENY ENROLLMENT-TRUANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-30SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2017-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-29SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-29SenateRe-assigned to Education
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-024-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-003-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105526-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback