IL HB3777 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Creates a bid incentive program for State-based manufacturers. Sets forth requirements needed to access the program and the bid incentive amount for the total dollar value of locally manufactured goods. Sets forth exemptions to the incentive program. Requires the maintenance of records and provides for penalties in the event a manufacturer fails to meet projected amounts of locally-manufactured goods. Allows the Department of Central Management Services to adopt rules to implement the program.
Title
PROCUREMENT-LOCAL PREFERENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To State Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3777&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3777.htm |