IL HB3770 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that no person shall cause or allow the storage or disposal of coal combustion waste over any United States Environmental Protection Agency Designated Sole Source Aquifer or within the limits of that aquifer's recharge area, nor cause or allow the use of coal combustion waste as cover for any waste disposal site located over any Designated Sole Source Aquifer or within the limits of that aquifer's recharge area, except when coal combustion waste is deposited on power plant property in a legally-permitted cell or impoundment associated with a power plant operating with valid permits. Provides, however, that once the power plant is closed, all coal combustion waste shall be removed and relocated to a location outside the Designated Sole Source Aquifer and placed in a lined facility or landfill designed according to scientifically-proven best practices and an Agency-approved closure plan. Provides that no person shall cause or allow the storage or disposal of coal combustion waste outside a Designated Sole Source Aquifer or a United States Designated Sole Source Aquifer's recharge area, unless specified conditions apply (currently, the specified conditions apply to all persons that cause or allow the storage or disposal of coal combustion waste). Makes a conforming change and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-DISPOSAL-COAL WASTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Environmental Regulations Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3770&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3770.htm |