IL HB3764 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that the increased percentage rate for each spouse and child for temporary total incapacity benefits, serious and permanent disfigurement benefits, and all cases other than temporary total disability benefits shall not exceed 100% of the total minimum wage calculation, nor 83 1/3% of the employee's average weekly wage, whichever is less (rather than shall not exceed 100% of the total minimum wage calculation, nor the employee's average weekly wage, whichever is less). Establishes a maximum weekly compensation rate in death cases, permanent total disability cases, temporary total disability cases, and for cases involving amputation of a member or enucleation of an eye beginning July 1, 2017 and thereafter. Establishes a minimum weekly compensation rate in permanent total disability cases beginning July 1, 2017 and thereafter. Changes the total compensation amount payable to an employee for an accidental injury not resulting in death. Makes changes to the benefit periods for accidental injuries resulting in the loss of or the permanent and complete loss of use of the thumb, fingers, or toes; the amputation of an arm, foot, or leg; the enucleation of an eye; and other injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKERS' COMP-BENEFIT RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseTo Workers Compensation Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback