IL HB3761 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that all townships within a coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipality may be discontinued under specified provisions (rather than townships that: are in coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipalities where the city council exercises the powers and duties of the township board, or in which one or more municipal officials serve as an officer or trustee of the township; are located within a county with a population of 3 million or more; and contain a territory of 7 square miles or more).
Title
TWP CD-TWP CONSOLIDATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 27-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 27 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3761&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3761.htm |