IL HB3758 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Officer Prohibited Activities Act. Prohibits an elected officer of a unit of local government from entering into or authorizing an employment contract, with the exception of a contract negotiated with a labor union, that would extend past the expiration of his or her elected term. Prohibits a governing body of a unit of local government from entering into or authorizing an employment contract, with the exception of a contract negotiated with a labor union, that would extend past the expiration of the term of the elected officer of the governing body whose term expires last. Provides that an employment contract entered into in violation of these provisions is voidable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV-EMPLOYMENT CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseRemains in Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501053.3New CodeSee Bill Text
501054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback