IL HB3755 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that certain attorney's fees shall be excluded from the demand given under specified provisions of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that in any litigation or arbitration between a unit owner and the association or its board of managers or any individual member of the association or its board of managers regarding specified disputes, if the unit owner is deemed by the court or arbitrator to be the substantially prevailing party, then the court or the arbitrator shall award to the unit owner from the non-prevailing party reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred by the unit owner in the litigation or arbitration.
Title
CONDOMINIUM ACT-ATTORNEY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-049-002 |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 9.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |