IL HB3754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in a county with more than 3,000,000 inhabitants, the Sheriff may establish a county impact incarceration program without the approval of the County Board of Commissioners. Provides that a person charged with a felony may be admitted into the program. Permits certain violent offenders to participate in the program. Excludes persons convicted of escape or aiding escape from eligibility for the program. Provides that the county impact incarceration program may (rather than shall) include, among other matters, vocational training, education, counseling, substance abuse counseling, life skills training, mandatory physical training and labor, military formation and drills, regimented activities, and uniformity of dress and appearance. Provides that the mandatory term of monitored release a person shall serve may be reduced by the accumulation of good time or pre-trial detention, up to 120 days. Provides that offenders who are charged with eligible offenses may be ordered to the custodial period of the county impact incarceration program. Provides that if the offender is convicted of the eligible offense, the court may sentence the offender to the remaining days required to complete a total participation period of 120 to 180 days and the mandatory term of monitored release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-CTY IMPACT INCARCERATN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-8-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback